Q1?find the sum by suitable rearrangement.
a) 832 + 553 + 168+ 447
b) 3578*123 - 3578*23

Q2? find the product of 85*102 using distributive property.

Dear Student,

a) 832 + 553 + 168+ 447
= (832 + 168) + (553 + 447)
= (1000 + 1000)
= 2000
 
b) 3578 × 123 - 3578 × 23
= 3578 × (123 - 23)
= 3578 × 100
= 357800

P. S. Kindly post the rest of the questions in a separate thread. 
Regards 

  • 1
What are you looking for?