how to calculate 42*54 in vedic math

Dear Student

42*54

42×54  =  ___4×5 =20 write 20 in the first blank 42×54  =  20__ 2×4 = 8 write 8 in the last blank 42×54  =  20_8 now 2×5+4×4 =10+16 = 26 write 6 in the middle blank and add 2 to the first blank 42×54  =  2268 So the answer is 2268Regards

  • 4
please tell me 
  • 1
Selling
  • -2
What are you looking for?